Voon, Kim Sien Kevin (CPSO#: 57326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
672 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2H3
Phone: (905) 637-1177
Fax: (905) 637-5120
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Voon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Voon ( CPSO# 57326 )

Business Address:
Suite 402
672 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2H3
Phone Number: (905) 637-1177

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIM SIEN KEVIN VOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1988