Voros, Mario (CPSO#: 73634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 3924
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: (705) 324-6111 Ext. 6198
Fax: (705) 328-2817
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

146 Oliver Road
Campbellford
Campbellford ON  K0V 1L0
Canada
Phone: (707) 653-1140
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Voros Greiner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Voros ( CPSO# 73634 )
Dr. K. Greiner ( CPSO# 72190 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 643-1140

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 328-6196


Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ng ( CPSO# 90845 )
Dr. P. Wilson ( CPSO# 74749 )
Dr. M. Voros ( CPSO# 73634 )
Dr. R. Sobiera ( CPSO# 65094 )
Dr. W. Myint ( CPSO# 67814 )
Dr. K. Millitz ( CPSO# 63758 )
Dr. S. Millward ( CPSO# 54715 )
Dr. K. King ( CPSO# 78979 )
Dr. G. Garneys ( CPSO# 67229 )
Dr. H. Aldis ( CPSO# 31600 )
Dr. D. Bourgeois ( CPSO# 54466 )
Dr. S. Harvie ( CPSO# 87296 )
Dr. R. Elyas ( CPSO# 90679 )
Dr. F. Abdelsayed ( CPSO# 100533)

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-3111

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIO VOROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOROS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004