Vosu, Helen Ann (CPSO#: 52252)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 18 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vosu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: North York General Hospital, 4001 Leslie Street,Toronto, ON, M2K 1E1
Date Received: 18 Jul 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 2016