Wade, Philip Stanley (CPSO#: 24974)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 23 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Phillip S. Wade Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 21 2016

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients requesting a copy of their medical records can call Dr. Wade at (613) 476-8170
Date Received: 23 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 18, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On November 14, 2014, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Philip Wade in respect of an incident that took place in 2004.