Wadgymar, Jose Arturo (CPSO#: 52236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Names: Harvey :, Jose Arturo (used until: 13 Apr 1993 )     Wadgymar Rivera, Jose Arturo (used until: 23 Oct 1986 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Queensway West
Suite 620
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 949-0372
Fax: (905) 949-0472
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arturo Wadgymar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wadgymar ( CPSO# 52236 )

Business Address:
620 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 949-0372

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSE ARTURO WADGYMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADGYMAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991