Wadhwa, Vikram Singh (CPSO#: 85294)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
Columbia University Medical Center
622 West 168th Street
New York NY  10032
United States
Phone: (917) 783-2604
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Radiology
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba
USA - California
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKRAM SINGH WADHWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADHWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 17 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006