Wagg, Brian Douglas (CPSO#: 29190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.D. Wagg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 6 2014


Corporation Name: Mathai-Wagg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Wagg ( CPSO# 90903 )
Dr. B. Wagg ( CPSO# 29190 )
Dr. G. Mathai ( CPSO# 30723 )
Dr. S. George ( CPSO# 30797 )
Dr. A. Mathai ( CPSO# 95206 )

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 549-3181

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN DOUGLAS WAGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAGG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1977