Waisman, Zohar (CPSO#: 68934)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores
Forensic Program
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 668-5881 Ext. 6816
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4711 yonge street
Toronto ON  M2N 6K8
Canada
Phone: 647 920 0660
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Centre for Addictions
and Mental Health
Law and Mental Health Program
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zohar Waisman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Waisman ( CPSO# 68934 )

Business Address:
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone Number: (905) 430-4055

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZOHAR WAISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAISMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 08 Dec 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000