Walker, James Douglas (CPSO#: 27420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Civic Parkdale Clinic
Room 10 Ground East
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone: (613) 761-4774
Fax: (613) 761-5093
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carleton Place and District Memoria
211 Lake Street
Carleton Place ON  K7C 3P5
Canada
Phone: (613) 257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Walker ( CPSO# 27420 )
Dr. M. Walker ( CPSO# 31504 )

Business Address:
Family Medicine Centre
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
10 - 737 Parkdale Avenue
Ground East
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone Number: (613) 761-4774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 26 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES DOUGLAS WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Mar 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1980