Walker, Michelle Louise (CPSO#: 84482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: (613) 968-8234
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

117 King St. E.
Oshawa ON  L1H1B9
Canada
Phone: 9057238551
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King St.
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

403 Main St. East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Canada
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle L. Walker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Walker ( CPSO# 84482 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9

Business Address:
403 Main Street East
P.O. Box 1900
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1008

Business Address:
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LOUISE WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2012