Walker, Robin Michael Cumnor (CPSO#: 67772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
376 Eagle Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1K4
Phone: (905) 868-8725
Fax: (905) 868-8727
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robin Walker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Walker ( CPSO# 67772 )

Business Address:
Unit 1
376 Eagle Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1K4
Phone Number: (905) 868-8725

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBIN MICHAEL CUMNOR WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999