Walker, Roxanne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 68933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100A
Unit 10 to 14
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (289) 337-2716
Fax: (289) 337-8396
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Walker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Walker ( CPSO# 68933 )

Business Address:
Suite 100A Unit 10-14
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (289) 337-2716

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROXANNE ELIZABETH WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 31 Mar 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2001