Walkes, Austin Cecil (CPSO#: 29803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1295 Pearl Street
Beaumont TX  77701
United States
Phone: (409) 835-8533
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

800 4th Street
Port Arthur TX  77640
United States
Phone: 409-983-8384
Fax: 409-989-3681
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AUSTIN CECIL WALKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Feb 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2008