Wallerstein, Avi (CPSO#: 66140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1992

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LASIK MD
First Canadian Place
100 King Street West Suite 120
M5X 2A1
Toronto ON  M5X2A1
Phone: 416-646-0266
Fax: 416-646-0270
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LASIK MD
5025 Orbiter Drive 3rd floor
Mississauga ON  L4W 4Y5
Canada
Phone: 416-362-8677
Fax: 416-626-0270
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVI WALLERSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLERSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1992

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)