Walmsley, Sharon Lynn (CPSO#: 52749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 13EN214
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3871
Fax: (416) 340-3357
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walmsley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Walmsley ( CPSO# 52749 )

Business Address:
Toronto General
13EN214
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 01 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON LYNN WALMSLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALMSLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1985