Walton, John Craig (CPSO#: 52229)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Walton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Stratford General Hospital Department of Pathology 46 General Hospital Drive Stratford, ON N5A 2Y6
Date Received: 21 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 13 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014