Wan, Michael Jonathan (CPSO#: 88376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
and Vision Sciences
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7015
Fax: (416) 813-7040
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael J. Wan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wan ( CPSO# 88376 )

Business Address:
150 Kilgour Road
East York ON  M4G 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 425-6220

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Opthalmology & Vision Sciences
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JONATHAN WAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015