Wang, Chen (CPSO#: 66082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Jiamusi Medical College, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Pathology and Lab Medicine
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4469
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6560 Kennedy Road
Mississauga ON  L5T 2X4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wang ( CPSO# 66082 )

Business Address:
6560 Kennedy Road
Mississauga ON  L5T 2X4
Phone Number: (905) 565-0043

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4469

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 06 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHEN WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 02 Nov 1993
Resident 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 02 Nov 1994
Resident 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 02 Nov 1995
Resident 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 02 Nov 1996
Resident 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1997