Wang, Cheng Tao (CPSO#: 65486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Family Practice Unit
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 867-7428
Fax: (416) 867-7498
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Centre West Toronto
150 Sherway Dr. 5th Floor
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 521-4068
Fax: (416) 521-4073
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Tao Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wang ( CPSO# 65486 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Family Practice Unit
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 867-7428

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-7580

Business Address:
707 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M5T 2W6
Phone Number: (416) 392-0335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHENG TAO WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2009