Wang, Elaine Ee-Ling (CPSO#: 52231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Sidney St.
Cambridge MA  02139
United States
Phone: (617)203-3449
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter P. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Wang ( CPSO# 52231 )
Dr. P. Liu ( CPSO# 32340 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Room H-2238
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
TGH, University Health Network
NCSB 11-1266
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 505-2132

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE EE-LING WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983