Wang, Henry (CPSO#: 33055)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Medical Health Centre
17215 Leslie Street
Unit G
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Phone: (905) 853-4253
Fax: (905) 853-2813
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Henry Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wang ( CPSO# 33055 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
York Medical Health Centre
17215 Leslie Street
Unit G
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Phone Number: (905) 853-4253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRY WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1982