Warbeck, Paul Julius (CPSO#: 54361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stewart Health Centre
904 Brightwell St
Box 8
Stewart BC  V0T 1W0
Phone: 250-636-2221
Fax: 250-636-2075
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Park Ave Medical Clinic
4634 Park Ave
Terrace BC  V8G 1V7
Canada
Phone: 250-615-5030
Fax: 250-615-5035
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JULIUS WARBECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARBECK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1993