Ward, Michael Robert (CPSO#: 95961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St.
Division of Cardiology
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4800
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CorCare
Suite 410
325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1
Canada
Phone: 416-284-4744
Fax: 416-284-0141
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Osler Cardiology
3 Conestoga Drive, Suite 200
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Canada
Phone: 905-495-4278
Fax: 905-452-1052
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ROBERT WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015