Waring, Steven Rae (CPSO#: 54357)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
91 King Street East
Colborne ON  K0K 1S1
Phone: (905) 355-2075
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven Waring Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Waring ( CPSO# 54357 )

Business Address:
91 King Street East
Colborne ON  K0K 1S1
Phone Number: (905) 355-2075

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Kansas

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN RAE WARING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1986