Warner, Ellen (CPSO#: 52213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4617
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellen Warner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Warner ( CPSO# 52213 )
Dr. J. Lipton ( CPSO# 58746 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4617

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELLEN WARNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1988