Warren, David William (CPSO#: 52296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
London Health Science Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
P O Box 5375
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8331
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. W. Warren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Warren ( CPSO# 52296 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E1-108
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 658-8331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID WILLIAM WARREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARREN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1982 to 14 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1985