Warren, Zachary Aloysius (CPSO#: 104061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Dec 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3400
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Zachary  Aloysius  Warren shall practise medicine as required by the
                  postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. Warren is enrolled at
                  Queen's University.

            (2)   In Dr. Warren's practice  in  the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. Warren shall prescribe drugs  only for in-patients or out-patients of
                  a clinical teaching unit that is formally  affiliated with the department
                  where  Dr.  Warren  is  properly  practising  medicine   and   to   which
                  postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of
                  its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In  Dr.  Warren's practice in the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. Warren shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Warren  may  practise  emergency  medicine  and  to the extent of his
                  employment  at  Lennox  and  Addington Country General Hospital  Napanee,
                  while under supervision coordinated  by  a  supervisor  acceptable to the
                  College.

            (5)   In Dr. Warren's practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr.  Warren  may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate  of registration expires, and Dr. Warren must thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when Dr. Warren  is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when Dr. Warren no  longer  holds  Canadian  citizenship, permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a valid employment authorization  under  the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically   converts  to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education certificate and Dr.  Warren must immediately cease all practice
                  outside the postgraduate medical education  program  if  any  one  of the
                  following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College  of
                        any  concerns  regarding  Dr.  Warren's practice, including but not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,   skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the supervisor is longer able or willing to continue  to  supervise
                        Dr. Warren's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   Warren  to  engage  in  practice  outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when  Dr. Warren's employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases;
                        or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr.  Warren  takes  a  leave of absence, or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the postgraduate  education  program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In  the  event  of  conversion   to   a  regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7) or expiry  of  the  certificate  under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Warren may not  resume  any  practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education  program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Warren  applies  for  a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  December 2, 2016.  In accordance  with
                  paragraph 6(a), this certificate of  registration  expires  on  June  30,
                  2018.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice   outside   the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.