Wasi, Parveen (CPSO#: 62083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street, Box 144
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73390
Fax: (905) 575-7320
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parveen Wasi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wasi ( CPSO# 62083 )

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 13 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARVEEN WASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1991