Wasser, Pnina Cheryl (CPSO#: 63458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5025 Sherbrooke West
Suite 415
Westmount QC  H4A 1S9
Phone: (514) 489-4014
Fax: (514) 489-1955
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's Hospital Center
3830 Lacombe Avenue
Montreal QC  H3T 1M5
Canada
Phone: (514) 734-2677
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PNINA CHERYL WASSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1995