Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Watson, Andrew Christopher (CPSO#: 54619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

140 prom du portage
gatineau QC  K1A 0J9
Canada
Phone: 1-819-654-2790
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Watson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Watson ( CPSO# 54619 )

Business Address:
140 Prom du Portage
Gatineau QC  K1A 0J9

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4080

Business Address:
502 McLeod Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 5R1
Phone Number: (613) 447-7471

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW CHRISTOPHER WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 1999 to 23 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1985