Weatherhead, Louis Edward Peirce (CPSO#: 52307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of the West Indies, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverside Professional Building
Suite 208
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 230-8191
Fax: (613) 230-4402
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louis Weatherhead Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Weatherhead ( CPSO# 52307 )

Business Address:
1919 Riverside Drive
Suite 208
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 230-8191

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS EDWARD PEIRCE WEATHERHEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEATHERHEAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1983