Webster, Colleen Allison (CPSO#: 68267)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: Kennedy, Colleen Allison (used until: 03 Sep 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2437 Princess Street
Suite 200
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone: (613) 546-6652
Fax: (613) 344-1365
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Andrew Webster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Webster ( CPSO# 103435)
Dr. C. Webster ( CPSO# 68267 )

Business Address:
200 - 2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone Number: (613) 546-6652


Corporation Name: Dr. Colleen A. Webster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Webster ( CPSO# 68267 )

Business Address:
200 - 2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone Number: (613) 546-6652

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLLEEN ALLISON WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1996