Webster, James (CPSO#: 62215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexander Medical Building
849 Alexander Court
Suite 210
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone: 705-876-1066
Fax: 705-876-8763
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Webster Auyeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Auyeung ( CPSO# 61290 )
Dr. J. Webster ( CPSO# 62215 )

Business Address:
Alexander Medical Building
210 - 849 Alexander Court
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone Number: (705) 876-1066

Business Address:
PRHC - 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1991