Weerasekera, Priyanthy (CPSO#: 55362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Psychotherapy Centre
Unit 228B
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 39881
Fax: (905) 540-6533
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weerasekera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Weerasekera ( CPSO# 55362 )

Business Address:
Psychotherapy Centre Hamilton
228B - 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRIYANTHY WEERASEKERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEERASEKERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1987