Weinberg, Eitan (CPSO#: 81057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: (416) 848-7664
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Grace Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2886
Fax: (416) 495-2538
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2 Champlain Drive
Toronto ON  M3H 2X1
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: (416) 222-9604
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1255 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K1E2
Canada
Phone: 4164980002
Fax: 4164980012
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6810
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weinberg and Tamir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Weinberg ( CPSO# 81057 )
Dr. D. Tamir ( CPSO# 78015 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia & Pain Management
EN 3-464- 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5164

Business Address:
3rd Floor
Room 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 848-7665

Business Address:
M4 and M5
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Business Address:
1255 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 1E2

Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EITAN WEINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 17 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010