Weinberg, Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 62480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
247 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B9
Phone: (905) 273-3045
Fax: (905) 273-3699
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 1
66 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 3N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 207-9090
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Weinberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Weinberg ( CPSO# 62480 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
66 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 3N8
Phone Number: (416) 207-9090

Business Address:
247 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 273-3045

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 28 Aug 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH WEINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1991