Weinberger, Allen Nathan (CPSO#: 52529)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pine Seven Medical Centre
Suite 180
4600 Highway 7 West
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-3330
Fax: (905) 856-3331
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allen Weinberger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Weinberger ( CPSO# 52529 )

Business Address:
Pine Seven Medical Centre
Suite 180
4600 Highway 7 West
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-3330

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLEN NATHAN WEINBERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINBERGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1984