Weinstein, David Matthew (CPSO#: 73516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 South Front Street
Suite 107
Belleville ON  K8N 2Y3
Phone: 613 779 6550
Fax: 613 210 1130
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

265 Dundas St E, Belleville
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: 613 969 7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Weinstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Weinstein ( CPSO# 73516 )

Business Address:
Suite 107
10 South Front Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2Y3
Phone Number: (613) 779-6550

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 779-6550

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MATTHEW WEINSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015