Weinstein, Gary Stuart (CPSO#: 61065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone: (416) 485-9044
Fax: (416) 485-8525
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Weinstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Weinstein ( CPSO# 61065 )

Business Address:
Yonge Eglinton Medical
210 - 2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone Number: (416) 485-9044

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY STUART WEINSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1992