Weinstein, Miriam Gayla (CPSO#: 69936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8186
Fax: (416) 813-7909
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 310
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Canada
Phone: (416) 492-5888
Fax: (416) 492-6569
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

4001 Leslie
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1466 Bathurst Street-#201
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Canada
Phone: 416-531-3331
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weinstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Weinstein ( CPSO# 69936 )

Business Address:
310 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 492-5888

Business Address:
201 - 1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 531-3331

Business Address:
COPC
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-1365

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
369 - 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6479

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Feb 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 15 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRIAM GAYLA WEINSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 15 Nov 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 16 Nov 1998 to 15 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 16 Nov 1999 to 19 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2000 to 19 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2001 to 19 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2002 to 19 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2003 to 15 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2001