Weir, Erica (CPSO#: 71690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King St W
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Ext. 53256
Fax: (613) 544-4017
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erica Weir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Weir ( CPSO# 71690 )

Business Address:
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERICA WEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2000