Weir, Martina June Egan (CPSO#: 62725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: Egan, Martina June (used until: 16 Sep 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: (905) 721-7763
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martina Weir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Weir ( CPSO# 62725 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
632 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 5S3
Phone Number: (905) 668-5851

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTINA JUNE EGAN WEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1991