Weisbrod, Matthew Jeffery (CPSO#: 65054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Shipyards Medical Arts Centre
Family Medicine
Unit 100
28 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C4
Phone: (705) 444-7200
Fax: (705) 444-7203
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew J. Weisbrod Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Weisbrod ( CPSO# 65054 )

Business Address:
The Shipyards Medical Arts Centre
Family Medicine
Unit 100
28 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C4
Phone Number: (705) 444-7200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JEFFERY WEISBROD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISBROD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993