Weiser, William Jack (CPSO#: 19534)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1965

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1965

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Diagnostic Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5672
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Weiser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Weiser ( CPSO# 19534 )

Business Address:
St. Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5672

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JACK WEISER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1965