Weiss, Ronald Stephen (CPSO#: 58382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
29 Clemow Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 2B1
Phone: (613) 235-3535
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ronald S. Weiss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Weiss ( CPSO# 58382 )

Business Address:
29 Clemow Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 2B1
Phone Number: (613) 235-3535

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD STEPHEN WEISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988