Weissler-Snir, Adaya (CPSO#: 107188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 16 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Room 4N 483
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-5510
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 Bond street
Saint Michael's Hospital
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel
United Kingdom

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAYA WEISSLER-SNIR may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. WEISSLER-SNIR is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. WEISSLER-SNIR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WEISSLER-SNIR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. WEISSLER-SNIR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. WEISSLER-SNIR ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. WEISSLER-SNIR ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Sep 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018