Weitzman, Brian Neil (CPSO#: 53593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Oct 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department Of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79002
Fax: (613) 737-8967
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Weitzman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Weitzman ( CPSO# 53593 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Site
Emergency Department
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN NEIL WEITZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEITZMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1983