Wells, Philip Stephen (CPSO#: 53868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
M1857 Box 206
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8755
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip S. Wells Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wells ( CPSO# 53868 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Suites M1840-M1859
Box 206
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8755

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP STEPHEN WELLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELLS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Clinical Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985