Wen, Joseph Yao Min (CPSO#: 74424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 626-6097
Fax: (416) 626-6087
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Wen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wen ( CPSO# 74424 )

Business Address:
Suite 412
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 626-6097

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH YAO MIN WEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2000 to 29 Mar 2000
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2003