Werger, Jeffrey Paul (CPSO#: 63926)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 Copper Creek Drive
Suite 105
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 472-6511
Fax: (905) 472-5436
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Werger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Werger ( CPSO# 63926 )

Business Address:
110 Copper Creek Drive
Suite 105
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-6511

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY PAUL WERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WERGER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992